Conservative
| Councillor Michael Bale | Member |
23/05/2013 - 14/05/2014
|
Labour
| Councillor Roy Bell | Member |
23/05/2013 - 14/05/2014
|
Conservative
| Councillor Lisa Brown | Vice-Chairman |
23/05/2013 - 14/05/2014
|
Labour
| Councillor Paul Dunn | Member |
17/06/2013 - 14/05/2014
|
Conservative
| Councillor Martyn Ford | Chairman |
23/05/2013 - 14/05/2014
|
Conservative
| Councillor Mrs. Margaret Elizabeth (Beth) Hall | Member |
23/05/2013 - 14/05/2014
|
Conservative
| Councillor Charles Jones | Member |
23/05/2013 - 14/05/2014
|
Labour
| Councillor Robert Pearson | Member |
15/10/2013 - 14/05/2014
|
Labour
| Councillor Kevin Richards | Member |
23/05/2013 - 14/05/2014
|
Labour
| Councillor David Shepherd | Member |
23/05/2013 - 14/05/2014
|