Conservative
| Councillor Lisa Brown | Chairman |
17/05/2018 - 15/05/2019
|
Conservative
| Councillor Martyn Ford | Member |
04/07/2018 - 15/05/2019
|
Conservative
| Councillor David Muller | Member |
17/05/2018 - 15/05/2019
|
Labour
| Councillor Robert Pearson | Member |
18/05/2018 - 15/05/2019
|
Labour
| Councillor David Shepherd | Member |
17/05/2018 - 15/05/2019
|
Labour
| Councillor Trevor Southerd | Member |
17/05/2018 - 15/05/2019
|
Labour
| Councillor Neil Tilley | Member |
17/05/2018 - 15/05/2019
|
Conservative
| Councillor Peter Watson | Member |
17/05/2018 - 15/05/2019
|
| Vacancy | |
|
| Vacancy | |
|